|
09/24/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 307, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2279.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 9. Page 2563.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 547.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 479.) (March 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Set for hearing March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|