California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB60 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2021

Amended

Bill August 23, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021