|
09/27/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2592.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 2918.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1377.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1198.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 687.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
April 6 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|