California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2021

Amended

Bill September 2, 2021
Bill August 30, 2021
Bill June 14, 2021
Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021