|
10/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 767, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2608.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 2936.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
June 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1199.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|