California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB628 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill August 30, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021