Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
August 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 887.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 687.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|