Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 985.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
April 26 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 3. Page 756.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referral to Com. on TRANS. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C., E.Q., and TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|