|
10/04/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 494, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2587.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 2933.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1379.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1199.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 956.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|