California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB664 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill July 8, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021