|
09/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2242.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
(Corrected July 19.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2376.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
June 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1227.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 843.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|