California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB756 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2021

Amended

Bill July 8, 2021
Bill June 21, 2021