|
09/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 222, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2213.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2472.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2021
|
June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 885.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 688.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|