California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB762 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2021

Amended

Bill June 14, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021