|
09/19/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 447, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5079.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6018.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1007.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 590.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|