California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB768 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2022

Amended

Bill August 15, 2022
Bill June 21, 2022
Bill June 2, 2022
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill March 16, 2021