|
09/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 468, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5346.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
(Received at desk July 5 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(c)).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2734.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wiener.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1204.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|