California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB793 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill August 15, 2022
Bill August 2, 2022
Bill January 3, 2022
Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill March 8, 2021