|
10/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 770, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2241.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2278.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1062.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 817.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|