California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB822 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2021

Amended

Bill June 21, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021