Senate
|
09/22/2022
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 5009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 2. Page 6006.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 3833.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3770.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3459.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26 in PUB. S. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|