California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB834 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022