Senate
|
09/27/2022
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5383.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3928.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3771.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3461.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3252.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|