California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB842 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022
Bill March 14, 2022