Senate
|
09/29/2022
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5307.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 5108.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Set for hearing August 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4961.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 6027.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3474.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3048.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Set for hearing March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|