California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB867 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Amended

Bill August 15, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill May 31, 2022