|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 662, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5315.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 3903.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3772.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3218.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|