California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB869 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill August 23, 2022
Bill August 15, 2022
Bill June 30, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022