|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 678, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 5021.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 5. Page 5886.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 2. Page 3833.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3540.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3292.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E.Q., and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|