California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB891 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill August 8, 2022
Bill June 21, 2022
Bill May 18, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022