|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 822, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5136.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 11. Page 6030.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 55. Noes 13. Page 5935.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 3835.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3775.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3348.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
March 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
(Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|