California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill June 23, 2022
Bill May 31, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022
Bill March 1, 2022