California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB971 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 2, 2022

Amended

Bill June 14, 2022
Bill May 16, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022