|
09/18/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 421, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5010.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6001.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3831.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3542.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
April 6 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|