California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB979 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2022

Amended

Bill August 18, 2022
Bill June 14, 2022
Bill May 11, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022