Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1237.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 842.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/28/2020
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|