09/10/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/10/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Senate | 08/30/2021 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2235.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2021 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Page 2435.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/14/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 13). | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 714.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | (Corrected March 19). | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |