California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR11 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2021

Amended

Bill June 29, 2021
Bill June 14, 2021