California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR69 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 69Introduced by Senator GroveFebruary 15, 2022 Relative to peace officers.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 69, as introduced, Grove. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Sunday, May 15, 2022, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of our peace officers bravery and dedication, and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; andWHEREAS, Peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; andWHEREAS, California peace officers have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; andWHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same peace officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; andWHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2021:(1) Deputy Adam Gibson, Sacramento County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: January 18, 2021.(2) Sergeant Richard P. Brown, Fresno Police Department, End of Watch: February 17, 2021.(3) Deputy Thomas J. Albanese, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: February 25, 2021.(4) Officer Jose Anzora, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: March 03, 2021.(5) Detective Luca Benedetti, San Luis Obispo Police Department, End of Watch: May 10, 2021.(6) Officer Jimmy Inn, Stockton Police Department, End of Watch: May 11, 2021.(7) Sergeant Dominic Vaca, San Bernardino County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: May 31, 2021.(8) Deputy Phillip Campas, Kern County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: July 25, 2021.(9) Officer Harminder Grewal, Galt Police Department, End of Watch: August 26, 2021.Resolved, That the Legislature designates Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place to live and raise our families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
33 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 69Introduced by Senator GroveFebruary 15, 2022 Relative to peace officers.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 69, as introduced, Grove. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
44
55
66
77
88
99 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION
1010
1111 Senate Concurrent Resolution
1212
1313 No. 69
1414
1515 Introduced by Senator GroveFebruary 15, 2022
1616
1717 Introduced by Senator Grove
1818 February 15, 2022
1919
2020 Relative to peace officers.
2121
2222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2323
2424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2525
2626 SCR 69, as introduced, Grove. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.
2727
2828 This measure would proclaim Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.
2929
3030 This measure would proclaim Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.
3131
3232 ## Digest Key
3333
3434 ## Bill Text
3535
3636 WHEREAS, Sunday, May 15, 2022, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; and
3737
3838 WHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of our peace officers bravery and dedication, and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; and
3939
4040 WHEREAS, Peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and
4141
4242 WHEREAS, California peace officers have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; and
4343
4444 WHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same peace officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; and
4545
4646 WHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it
4747
4848 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2021:
4949
5050 (1) Deputy Adam Gibson, Sacramento County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: January 18, 2021.
5151
5252 (2) Sergeant Richard P. Brown, Fresno Police Department, End of Watch: February 17, 2021.
5353
5454 (3) Deputy Thomas J. Albanese, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: February 25, 2021.
5555
5656 (4) Officer Jose Anzora, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: March 03, 2021.
5757
5858 (5) Detective Luca Benedetti, San Luis Obispo Police Department, End of Watch: May 10, 2021.
5959
6060 (6) Officer Jimmy Inn, Stockton Police Department, End of Watch: May 11, 2021.
6161
6262 (7) Sergeant Dominic Vaca, San Bernardino County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: May 31, 2021.
6363
6464 (8) Deputy Phillip Campas, Kern County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: July 25, 2021.
6565
6666 (9) Officer Harminder Grewal, Galt Police Department, End of Watch: August 26, 2021.
6767
6868 Resolved, That the Legislature designates Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place to live and raise our families; and be it further
6969
7070 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.