California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR69 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/15/2022

                            CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 69Introduced by Senator GroveFebruary 15, 2022 Relative to peace officers.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 69, as introduced, Grove. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Sunday, May 15, 2022, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of our peace officers bravery and dedication, and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; andWHEREAS, Peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; andWHEREAS, California peace officers have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; andWHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same peace officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; andWHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2021:(1) Deputy Adam Gibson, Sacramento County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: January 18, 2021.(2) Sergeant Richard P. Brown, Fresno Police Department, End of Watch: February 17, 2021.(3) Deputy Thomas J. Albanese, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: February 25, 2021.(4) Officer Jose Anzora, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: March 03, 2021.(5) Detective Luca Benedetti, San Luis Obispo Police Department, End of Watch: May 10, 2021.(6) Officer Jimmy Inn, Stockton Police Department, End of Watch: May 11, 2021.(7) Sergeant Dominic Vaca, San Bernardino County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: May 31, 2021.(8) Deputy Phillip Campas, Kern County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: July 25, 2021.(9) Officer Harminder Grewal, Galt Police Department, End of Watch: August 26, 2021.Resolved, That the Legislature designates Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place to live and raise our families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 69Introduced by Senator GroveFebruary 15, 2022 Relative to peace officers.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 69, as introduced, Grove. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Concurrent Resolution 

No. 69

Introduced by Senator GroveFebruary 15, 2022

Introduced by Senator Grove
February 15, 2022

 Relative to peace officers.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SCR 69, as introduced, Grove. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.

This measure would proclaim Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.

This measure would proclaim Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Sunday, May 15, 2022, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; and

WHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of our peace officers bravery and dedication, and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; and

WHEREAS, Peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and

WHEREAS, California peace officers have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; and

WHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same peace officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; and

WHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2021:

(1) Deputy Adam Gibson, Sacramento County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: January 18, 2021.

(2) Sergeant Richard P. Brown, Fresno Police Department, End of Watch: February 17, 2021.

(3) Deputy Thomas J. Albanese, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: February 25, 2021.

(4) Officer Jose Anzora, Los Angeles Police Department, End of Watch: March 03, 2021.

(5) Detective Luca Benedetti, San Luis Obispo Police Department, End of Watch: May 10, 2021.

(6) Officer Jimmy Inn, Stockton Police Department, End of Watch: May 11, 2021.

(7) Sergeant Dominic Vaca, San Bernardino County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: May 31, 2021.

(8) Deputy Phillip Campas, Kern County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: July 25, 2021.

(9) Officer Harminder Grewal, Galt Police Department, End of Watch: August 26, 2021.

Resolved, That the Legislature designates Sunday, May 15, 2022, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place to live and raise our families; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.