|
09/13/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5341.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5955.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3476.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3252.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|