California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR70 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022