04/22/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2022. | |||
04/22/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4217.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 31). | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3207.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | (Corrected February 25.) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |