1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 76 CHAPTER 46 Relative to Sudden Unexplained Death in Childhood Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 22, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 76, Hurtado. Sudden Unexplained Death in Childhood Awareness Month.This measure would recognize March 2022 as Sudden Unexplained Death in Childhood Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Sudden unexplained death in childhood (SUDC) is a category of death in children between 1 and 18 years of age, inclusive, that remains unexplained after a thorough investigation, including an autopsy; andWHEREAS, Each year there are approximately 400 cases of SUDC in the United States, including more than 200 younger children between one and four years of age, inclusive, who die without any clear cause or explanation; andWHEREAS, While less common than sudden infant death syndrome (SIDS), which occurs before the first birthday, SUDC is an important health concern deserving of increased public awareness and research; andWHEREAS, SUDC is the fifth leading category of death among children between one and four years of age, inclusive, in the United States; andWHEREAS, There currently is no way to predict or prevent SUDC as its cause is unknown; andWHEREAS, It is hoped that future research will identify means by which SUDC can be prevented; andWHEREAS, We recognize the dedicated efforts of organizations, including the SUDC Foundation, medical professionals, medicolegal death investigators, and volunteers who are working to better understand the causes of SUDC, improve the health of infants and children, and provide much-needed hope and support for those families grieving the heartbreaking sudden, unexplained death of a child; andWHEREAS, Sudden Unexplained Death in Childhood Awareness Month provides an opportunity to honor the memory of the young lives that ended too soon, show encouragement and support for the families and loved ones devastated by their loss, and increase public awareness of SUDC and the ongoing search for answers; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes March 2022 as Sudden Unexplained Death in Childhood Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled April 19, 2022 Passed IN Senate March 24, 2022 Passed IN Assembly April 07, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 76Introduced by Senator Hurtado(Coauthor: Senator Caballero)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Carrillo, Cooley, Arambula, Bennett, Berman, Bloom, Calderon, Cervantes, Chen, Choi, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Flora, Fong, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Kalra, Kiley, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nguyen, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, and Wilson)February 23, 2022 Relative to Sudden Unexplained Death in Childhood Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 76, Hurtado. Sudden Unexplained Death in Childhood Awareness Month.This measure would recognize March 2022 as Sudden Unexplained Death in Childhood Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Sudden unexplained death in childhood (SUDC) is a category of death in children between 1 and 18 years of age, inclusive, that remains unexplained after a thorough investigation, including an autopsy; andWHEREAS, Each year there are approximately 400 cases of SUDC in the United States, including more than 200 younger children between one and four years of age, inclusive, who die without any clear cause or explanation; andWHEREAS, While less common than sudden infant death syndrome (SIDS), which occurs before the first birthday, SUDC is an important health concern deserving of increased public awareness and research; andWHEREAS, SUDC is the fifth leading category of death among children between one and four years of age, inclusive, in the United States; andWHEREAS, There currently is no way to predict or prevent SUDC as its cause is unknown; andWHEREAS, It is hoped that future research will identify means by which SUDC can be prevented; andWHEREAS, We recognize the dedicated efforts of organizations, including the SUDC Foundation, medical professionals, medicolegal death investigators, and volunteers who are working to better understand the causes of SUDC, improve the health of infants and children, and provide much-needed hope and support for those families grieving the heartbreaking sudden, unexplained death of a child; andWHEREAS, Sudden Unexplained Death in Childhood Awareness Month provides an opportunity to honor the memory of the young lives that ended too soon, show encouragement and support for the families and loved ones devastated by their loss, and increase public awareness of SUDC and the ongoing search for answers; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes March 2022 as Sudden Unexplained Death in Childhood Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|