08/01/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/01/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12 p.m. | |||
Senate | 08/01/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5684.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2022 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3673.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3522.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |