1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 98 CHAPTER 107 Relative to the Fortuna Police Officer Raymond Quincy Mills Memorial Highway. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 01, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 98, McGuire. Fortuna Police Officer Raymond Quincy Mills Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 101 in the City of Fortuna as the Fortuna Police Officer Raymond Quincy Mills Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Fortuna Police Officer Raymond Quincy Mills was born on July 8, 1934; and WHEREAS, Officer Mills was a veteran who served in the Korean War before joining the Fortuna Police Department as an auxiliary officer in December of 1964, when a flood known as the thousand year flood struck Northern California; andWHEREAS, Officer Mills attended the Concord Police Academy and became a regular full-time member of the Fortuna Police Department on July 1, 1965; andWHEREAS, In the early morning of Sunday, March 12, 1967, Officer Mills, 32, was tragically killed in the line of duty when he was fatally struck by a motorist while providing backup during a traffic stop on northbound Highway 101; andWHEREAS, Officer Mills is remembered by his friends and neighbors as a fun-loving, energetic, intelligent, generous, friendly, and down-to-earth person who was always willing to put aside his own concerns to help his friends; andWHEREAS, At the time of his passing, Officer Mills was survived by his wife, Virginia Mays, his two sons, Jonathan Ray Mills and Donald Franklin Mills, and many beloved family members and friends; andWHEREAS, Despite the years that have passed since his passing, Officer Mills continues to be remembered by all who knew him, and will be remembered by the generations to come for his professionalism, hard work, and dedication to his community; andWHEREAS, In Rohner Park in the City of Fortuna stands a wooden memorial plaque donated by the Fortuna Policewomens Auxiliary in memory of Officer Mills; andWHEREAS, Another memorial stone outside the Fortuna Police station and Fortuna City Hall bears the inscription, In memory of Officer Ray Q. Mills who gave his life in the line of duty March 12, 1967.; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature expresses its condolences and heartfelt sorrow for the tragic loss suffered by the City of Fortuna Police Department and the family and friends of Officer Mills as a result of his untimely death in the line of duty; expresses its appreciation for the service and dedication of Officer Mills; and hereby commends and recognizes the professionalism, bravery, and selflessness of Officer Mills in the performance of his duties; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature designates the portion of State Highway Route 101 from Kenmar Road at postmile 59.503 to Palmer Blvd at postmile 62.229 in the City of Fortuna as the Fortuna Police Officer Raymond Quincy Mills Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation, and upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled July 13, 2022 Passed IN Senate May 12, 2022 Passed IN Assembly June 30, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 98Introduced by Senator McGuire(Coauthors: Assembly Members Wood, Aguiar-Curry, Alvarez, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bigelow, Boerner Horvath, Mia Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Flora, Fong, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gray, Grayson, Haney, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, McKinnor, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nguyen, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wilson)April 07, 2022 Relative to the Fortuna Police Officer Raymond Quincy Mills Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 98, McGuire. Fortuna Police Officer Raymond Quincy Mills Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 101 in the City of Fortuna as the Fortuna Police Officer Raymond Quincy Mills Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Fortuna Police Officer Raymond Quincy Mills was born on July 8, 1934; and WHEREAS, Officer Mills was a veteran who served in the Korean War before joining the Fortuna Police Department as an auxiliary officer in December of 1964, when a flood known as the thousand year flood struck Northern California; andWHEREAS, Officer Mills attended the Concord Police Academy and became a regular full-time member of the Fortuna Police Department on July 1, 1965; andWHEREAS, In the early morning of Sunday, March 12, 1967, Officer Mills, 32, was tragically killed in the line of duty when he was fatally struck by a motorist while providing backup during a traffic stop on northbound Highway 101; andWHEREAS, Officer Mills is remembered by his friends and neighbors as a fun-loving, energetic, intelligent, generous, friendly, and down-to-earth person who was always willing to put aside his own concerns to help his friends; andWHEREAS, At the time of his passing, Officer Mills was survived by his wife, Virginia Mays, his two sons, Jonathan Ray Mills and Donald Franklin Mills, and many beloved family members and friends; andWHEREAS, Despite the years that have passed since his passing, Officer Mills continues to be remembered by all who knew him, and will be remembered by the generations to come for his professionalism, hard work, and dedication to his community; andWHEREAS, In Rohner Park in the City of Fortuna stands a wooden memorial plaque donated by the Fortuna Policewomens Auxiliary in memory of Officer Mills; andWHEREAS, Another memorial stone outside the Fortuna Police station and Fortuna City Hall bears the inscription, In memory of Officer Ray Q. Mills who gave his life in the line of duty March 12, 1967.; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature expresses its condolences and heartfelt sorrow for the tragic loss suffered by the City of Fortuna Police Department and the family and friends of Officer Mills as a result of his untimely death in the line of duty; expresses its appreciation for the service and dedication of Officer Mills; and hereby commends and recognizes the professionalism, bravery, and selflessness of Officer Mills in the performance of his duties; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature designates the portion of State Highway Route 101 from Kenmar Road at postmile 59.503 to Palmer Blvd at postmile 62.229 in the City of Fortuna as the Fortuna Police Officer Raymond Quincy Mills Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation, and upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|