LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR12
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR12
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR12
Action History
Senate
03/18/2021
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 546.)
Senate
03/16/2021
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 518.) (March 16).
Senate
03/05/2021
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
03/04/2021
Set for hearing March 16.
Senate
02/25/2021
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
02/16/2021
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.