California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR12 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/19/2021

                            Enrolled  March 19, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  March 18, 2021 Amended IN  Senate  March 05, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 12Introduced by Senator Min(Coauthor: Senator Pan)February 16, 2021Relative to hate crimes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 12, Min. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The Asian Pacific Policy and Planning Council and Chinese for Affirmative Action launched a hate incident-reporting internet website, titled Stop AAPI Hate, at the beginning of the COVID-19 outbreak in March of 2020; andWHEREAS, The Stop AAPI Hate reporting center documented over 2,800 hate incidents nationally against Asian Pacific Islander (API) Americans in 2020; andWHEREAS, Over 700 of these incidents occurred in the bay area of California; andWHEREAS, Racism toward APIs has always existed, such as the 19th-century scapegoating of APIs, also known as the Yellow Peril; andWHEREAS, Racism against APIs has been exacerbated by the COVID-19 pandemic; andWHEREAS, Politically charged and culturally insensitive rhetoric referring to COVID-19 as the Chinese virus or kung flu further encourages racism, prejudice, and hate crimes against APIs; andWHEREAS, The promotion of such language by former President Donald Trump during his term further propagated anti-API sentiments in light of COVID-19; andWHEREAS, On January 31, 2021, three elderly APIs were assaulted in the City of Oaklands Chinatown District, including a 91-year-old API man who sustained serious injuries, such as lacerations, abrasions, and a contusion to the left thumb, in what is deemed a hate crime; andWHEREAS, On January 30, 2021, 84-year-old Vicha Ratanapakdee, a nearly-blind and gentle elderly Thai man, died from injuries resulting from an attack while he was walking in the City of San Francisco, in what is deemed as a hate crime; andWHEREAS, About 31 percent of APIs report having been subject to discrimination since the beginning of the COVID-19 pandemic, according to a Pew Research Center report; andWHEREAS, APIs in the State of California are increasingly concerned about their safety and well-being, given the rise of hate crimes and other racially motivated attacks; andWHEREAS, In 2020, the California State Legislatures API Legislative Caucus made efforts toward defending immigrant and refugee communities, engaged with hundreds of people to discuss xenophobia, and spoke out against anti-API hate incidents and hate crimes, while confronting realities of a worldwide pandemic; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate denounces hate crimes, hateful rhetoric, and hateful acts against Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders, and works to ensure that APIs feel safe and welcome, both during this COVID-19 pandemic and beyond; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  March 19, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  March 18, 2021 Amended IN  Senate  March 05, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 12Introduced by Senator Min(Coauthor: Senator Pan)February 16, 2021Relative to hate crimes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 12, Min. Digest Key

 Enrolled  March 19, 2021 Passed IN  Senate  March 18, 2021 Amended IN  Senate  March 05, 2021

Enrolled  March 19, 2021
Passed IN  Senate  March 18, 2021
Amended IN  Senate  March 05, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 12

Introduced by Senator Min(Coauthor: Senator Pan)February 16, 2021

Introduced by Senator Min(Coauthor: Senator Pan)
February 16, 2021

Relative to hate crimes. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 12, Min. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The Asian Pacific Policy and Planning Council and Chinese for Affirmative Action launched a hate incident-reporting internet website, titled Stop AAPI Hate, at the beginning of the COVID-19 outbreak in March of 2020; and

WHEREAS, The Stop AAPI Hate reporting center documented over 2,800 hate incidents nationally against Asian Pacific Islander (API) Americans in 2020; and

WHEREAS, Over 700 of these incidents occurred in the bay area of California; and

WHEREAS, Racism toward APIs has always existed, such as the 19th-century scapegoating of APIs, also known as the Yellow Peril; and

WHEREAS, Racism against APIs has been exacerbated by the COVID-19 pandemic; and

WHEREAS, Politically charged and culturally insensitive rhetoric referring to COVID-19 as the Chinese virus or kung flu further encourages racism, prejudice, and hate crimes against APIs; and

WHEREAS, The promotion of such language by former President Donald Trump during his term further propagated anti-API sentiments in light of COVID-19; and

WHEREAS, On January 31, 2021, three elderly APIs were assaulted in the City of Oaklands Chinatown District, including a 91-year-old API man who sustained serious injuries, such as lacerations, abrasions, and a contusion to the left thumb, in what is deemed a hate crime; and

WHEREAS, On January 30, 2021, 84-year-old Vicha Ratanapakdee, a nearly-blind and gentle elderly Thai man, died from injuries resulting from an attack while he was walking in the City of San Francisco, in what is deemed as a hate crime; and

WHEREAS, About 31 percent of APIs report having been subject to discrimination since the beginning of the COVID-19 pandemic, according to a Pew Research Center report; and

WHEREAS, APIs in the State of California are increasingly concerned about their safety and well-being, given the rise of hate crimes and other racially motivated attacks; and

WHEREAS, In 2020, the California State Legislatures API Legislative Caucus made efforts toward defending immigrant and refugee communities, engaged with hundreds of people to discuss xenophobia, and spoke out against anti-API hate incidents and hate crimes, while confronting realities of a worldwide pandemic; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate denounces hate crimes, hateful rhetoric, and hateful acts against Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders, and works to ensure that APIs feel safe and welcome, both during this COVID-19 pandemic and beyond; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.