LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR45
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR45
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR45
Action History
Senate
04/04/2022
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3304.)
Senate
03/30/2022
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (March 29).
Senate
03/17/2022
Set for hearing March 29.
Senate
03/16/2022
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
08/18/2021
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
07/14/2021
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.