California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR7 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Enrolled February 17, 2021 Passed IN Senate February 12, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 7Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Grove, Hurtado, Leyva, and Melendez)February 01, 2021 Relative to California Girls and Women in Sports Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 7, Ochoa Bogh. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, President Ronald Reagan declared February 4, 1987, as the first National Women in Sports Day, in recognition of the history of womens athletics and the progress made by the Title IX amendment passed in 1972, codifying nondiscrimination in sports programs; andWHEREAS, National Girls and Women in Sports Day exists to acknowledge past, and recognize current, sports achievements, the positive influence of sports participation, and the continuing struggle for equity, pay, and access for women in sports; andWHEREAS, Participation in sports is acknowledged as a positive force in developing and promoting the physical, mental, moral, social, and emotional well-being of all individuals. In addition to establishing a healthy, active lifestyle, sports build confidence, leadership skills, and the ability to work with a team; andWHEREAS, A need for increased opportunities exists for girls to participate in and pursue physical activity at the community and scholastic levels to improve their health and well-being and to develop lifelong fitness habits at an early age; andWHEREAS, Girls and womens athletics is one of the most effective avenues available through which women may develop self-discipline, initiative, and confidence, regardless of background; andWHEREAS, Girls and women of all ages are encouraged to participate in, and contribute to, sports at all levels of competition and help prepare the next generation of female sports leaders; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California,That February 1, 2021, to February 6, 2021, inclusive, be declared California Girls and Women in Sports Week to acknowledge the contributions of, and to recognize, girls and women in sports in California; and be it furtherResolved, That all teachers, school administrators, and community policymakers take appropriate measures to ensure equity in sports programs and activities in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 7Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Grove, Hurtado, Leyva, and Melendez)February 01, 2021 Relative to California Girls and Women in Sports Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 7, as introduced, Ochoa Bogh. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, President Ronald Reagan declared February 4, 1987, as the first National Women in Sports Day, in recognition of the history of womens athletics and the progress made by the Title IX amendment passed in 1972, codifying nondiscrimination in sports programs; andWHEREAS, National Girls and Women in Sports Day exists to acknowledge past, and recognize current, sports achievements, the positive influence of sports participation, and the continuing struggle for equity, pay, and access for women in sports; andWHEREAS, Participation in sports is acknowledged as a positive force in developing and promoting the physical, mental, moral, social, and emotional well-being of all individuals. In addition to establishing a healthy, active lifestyle, sports build confidence, leadership skills, and the ability to work with a team; andWHEREAS, A need for increased opportunities exists for girls to participate in and pursue physical activity at the community and scholastic levels to improve their health and well-being and to develop lifelong fitness habits at an early age; andWHEREAS, Girls and womens athletics is one of the most effective avenues available through which women may develop self-discipline, initiative, and confidence, regardless of background; andWHEREAS, Girls and women of all ages are encouraged to participate in, and contribute to, sports at all levels of competition and help prepare the next generation of female sports leaders; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California,That February 1, 2021, to February 6, 2021, inclusive, be declared California Girls and Women in Sports Week to acknowledge the contributions of, and to recognize, girls and women in sports in California; and be it furtherResolved, That all teachers, school administrators, and community policymakers take appropriate measures to ensure equity in sports programs and activities in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Enrolled February 17, 2021 Passed IN Senate February 12, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 7Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Grove, Hurtado, Leyva, and Melendez)February 01, 2021 Relative to California Girls and Women in Sports Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 7, Ochoa Bogh. Digest Key
3+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 7Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Grove, Hurtado, Leyva, and Melendez)February 01, 2021 Relative to California Girls and Women in Sports Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 7, as introduced, Ochoa Bogh. Digest Key
44
5- Enrolled February 17, 2021 Passed IN Senate February 12, 2021
65
7-Enrolled February 17, 2021
8-Passed IN Senate February 12, 2021
6+
7+
98
109 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION
1110
1211 Senate Resolution
1312
1413 No. 7
1514
1615 Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Grove, Hurtado, Leyva, and Melendez)February 01, 2021
1716
1817 Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Grove, Hurtado, Leyva, and Melendez)
1918 February 01, 2021
2019
2120 Relative to California Girls and Women in Sports Week.
2221
2322 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2423
2524 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2625
27-SR 7, Ochoa Bogh.
26+SR 7, as introduced, Ochoa Bogh.
2827
2928
3029
3130 ## Digest Key
3231
3332 ## Bill Text
3433
3534 WHEREAS, President Ronald Reagan declared February 4, 1987, as the first National Women in Sports Day, in recognition of the history of womens athletics and the progress made by the Title IX amendment passed in 1972, codifying nondiscrimination in sports programs; and
3635
3736 WHEREAS, National Girls and Women in Sports Day exists to acknowledge past, and recognize current, sports achievements, the positive influence of sports participation, and the continuing struggle for equity, pay, and access for women in sports; and
3837
3938 WHEREAS, Participation in sports is acknowledged as a positive force in developing and promoting the physical, mental, moral, social, and emotional well-being of all individuals. In addition to establishing a healthy, active lifestyle, sports build confidence, leadership skills, and the ability to work with a team; and
4039
4140 WHEREAS, A need for increased opportunities exists for girls to participate in and pursue physical activity at the community and scholastic levels to improve their health and well-being and to develop lifelong fitness habits at an early age; and
4241
4342 WHEREAS, Girls and womens athletics is one of the most effective avenues available through which women may develop self-discipline, initiative, and confidence, regardless of background; and
4443
4544 WHEREAS, Girls and women of all ages are encouraged to participate in, and contribute to, sports at all levels of competition and help prepare the next generation of female sports leaders; now, therefore, be it
4645
4746 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California,That February 1, 2021, to February 6, 2021, inclusive, be declared California Girls and Women in Sports Week to acknowledge the contributions of, and to recognize, girls and women in sports in California; and be it further
4847
4948 Resolved, That all teachers, school administrators, and community policymakers take appropriate measures to ensure equity in sports programs and activities in California; and be it further
5049
5150 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.